Nautilus Insurance Company v. SOCAYR SFH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: SOCAYR SFH, LLC and Micheshia Norment
Case Number: 3:2019cv00485
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Micheshia Norment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Dismissing) (Chervenak, Sarah)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/6/2019; Defendant Micheshia Norment shall have through 8/30/2019 to serve a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint. cc: counsel (JM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER/STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Micheshia Norment. (Chervenak, Sarah) Modified to edit docket text on 8/6/2019 (JWM).
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Micheshia Norment served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt) (Endicott, Jill)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nautilus Insurance Company. SOCAYR SFH, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green Card) (Endicott, Jill)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Admiral Insurance Company, Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkley Insurance Company for Nautilus Insurance Company. (JWM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Micheshia Norment, SOCAYR SFH, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Micheshia Norment, SOCAYR SFH, LLC, filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2897405. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Hobbs Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit B-Policy, #4 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. SOCAYR SFH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCAYR SFH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheshia Norment
Represented By: Sarah A. Chervenak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Jill F. Endicott
Represented By: Marisa E. Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?