McElroy v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kathi McElroy
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC and P'Pool & Roy, PLLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00494
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Kathi McElroy (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McKenzie, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. (Duncan, Michelle)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/25/2019. Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including 8/20/2019. (ALS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (AGREED) by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
July 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/21/2019, GRANTING #4 Motion for Anna-Katrina S. Christakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Anna-Katrina S. Christakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2903191. by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019 to separate documents : #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (ALS).
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Mariner Finance, LLC, #2 Summons P'Pool & Roy, PLLC) (ALS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2898824) filed by Kathi McElroy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Mariner Note, #3 Exhibit B - Collection Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Motion for Default, #5 Exhibit D - Default Judgment, #6 Exhibit E - Wage Garnishment) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElroy v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariner Finance, LLC
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P'Pool & Roy, PLLC
Represented By: Michelle Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathi McElroy
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?