Patterson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Courtney Conley and Tammie Patterson
Defendant: Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00501
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 NOTICE of email confirmation as to David Hemminger re #5 Request for Fee Refund (MLG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Fee Refund by Tammie Patterson. (Hemminger, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: incorrect document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #1 Complaint ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet) (Hemminger, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (ALS) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/17/2019-Iss date changed to 7/17/19) (MLG). (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/17/2019) (MLG).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2901200) filed by Courtney Conley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Conley
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Patterson
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?