Barley v. Ramos et al
Plaintiff: Kerry Barley
Defendant: Estate of Izeyha Carr, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, John and/or Jane Does, Erik Ramos and Mark Bolton
Case Number: 3:2019cv00510
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Response to Motion filed by Mark Bolton, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government. (Ogburn, J.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Response to Motion by Defendants Mark Bolton, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ogburn, J.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kerry Barley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Joseph T. Greenwell, #4 Summons Bryan J. Ewald) (Pohl, Martin)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kerry Barley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pohl, Martin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Mark Bolton, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Ogburn, J.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Estate of Izeyha Carr, Erik Ramos. (Ogburn, J.)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/15/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-003753. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (AME)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mark Bolton, Erik Ramos, John and/or Jane Does, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Estate of Izeyha Carr from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-003753. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2901367), filed by Mark Bolton, Erik Ramos, John and/or Jane Does, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Estate of Izeyha Carr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barley v. Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Izeyha Carr
Represented By: J. Denis Ogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government
Represented By: J. Denis Ogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does
Represented By: J. Denis Ogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Ramos
Represented By: J. Denis Ogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bolton
Represented By: J. Denis Ogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Barley
Represented By: Martin A. Pohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?