Burns v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Kendrick Burns
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00514
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Roth, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Upon review of this matter and on the Court's own motion, the undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from the above-styled action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay (EBOC) on 7/19/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. Counsel shall confirm participation in the conference by providing a direct dial telephone number to Magistrate Judge Lindsay's Case Manager, Theresa Burch, at theresa_burch@kywd.uscourts.gov no later than three (3) days prior to the conference. Any request for a change of the conference date shall be made to Ms. Burch. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Kendrick Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Police Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Letter to GEICO dated July 19, 2018, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Tortfeasor Insurance Coverage, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - GEICO Policy Coverage, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - GEICO Email dated June 10, 2019, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - GEICO's Requests for Admissions, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Burns' Responses to Requests for Admissions, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Letter from GEICO dated July 25, 2018, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding to State Court) (Fain, Isaac)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/18/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-001777. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court. (AME)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
July 15, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO Indemnity Company. (AME)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO Indemnity Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-001777. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2903102), filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Maryland Secretary of State Filing, #4 Exhibit C - Pls Response to Req for Admissions) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Burns
Represented By: Isaac T. Fain
Represented By: Scott A. Wallitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Mark E. Roth
Represented By: Charles H. Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?