Violett v. King et al
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Violett
Defendant: Deanna Mann, Daniel King, Captain Jeffery Hope and Warden Anna Valentine
Case Number: 3:2019cv00524
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Depose by Plaintiff Donald Ray Violett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KD)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/5/2019, granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 under an installment plan. The Clerk of this Court is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. Having addressed the filing fee issue, the Court must now undertake a preliminary review of Plaintiff's complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Once the review is complete, an order will be entered informing the parties of what steps, if any, must be taken. Please see Order for further details. cc: Plaintiff; Financial Section, USDC, WDKY; Kentucky State Reformatory (KD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Donald Ray Violett. (KD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Donald Ray Violett. (KD)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis not filed, nor Summons for Defendants filed.. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/16/2019. (DJT)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Donald Ray Violett. (DJT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffery Hope, Daniel King, Deanna Mann, Anna Valentine, filed by Donald Ray Violett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Violett v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jeffery Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Anna Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Violett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?