Daniel-Swann v. GC Services Limited Partnership-Delaware et al
Plaintiff: Sherri Daniel-Swann
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency and GC Services Limited Partnership-Delaware
Case Number: 3:2019cv00525
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/13/2019; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 11:00 AM ET/10:00 AM CT before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the Toll Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering Access Code 7238577#. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 10/12/2019 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 10/15/2019. (Review Order in full for specifics, including conference agenda and report requirements.) cc: Counsel; MB (CDF)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 09/13/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; Judge King's Chambers (TJD)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership-Delaware by Sherri Daniel-Swann (Lawson, James)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING GC SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP-DELAWARE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/13/2019 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer up to and including 9/13/2019, re #1 Complaint. cc: Counsel (CDF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Kenney, Jonathan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative and Other Defenses by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Kenney, Jonathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership-Delaware (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Main, Marisa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to GC Services Limited Partnership-Delaware, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against GC Services Limited Partnership-Delaware and Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, filed by Sherri Daniel-Swann. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2905048. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel-Swann v. GC Services Limited Partnership-Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services Limited Partnership-Delaware
Represented By: Marisa E. Main
Represented By: Joseph N. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Daniel-Swann
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?