Bennett v. Credit One Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Rickie D. Bennett, Jr.
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00529
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rickie D. Bennett, Jr. (Lawson, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A. by Rickie D. Bennett, Jr (Lawson, James)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/15/2019. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. The parties shall comply as set forth in the Order. cc: Counsel (RLJ) Modified on 8/16/2019 to correct clerk mistake (RLJ).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/15/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/2/2019. Defendant, Credit One Bank, N.A., shall have through and including 9/24/2019, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint herein.cc: Counsel (RLJ)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Jackson, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit One Bank, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) (ALS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit One Bank, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2906863) filed by Rickie D. Bennett, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Credit One Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Represented By: James B. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie D. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?