Dukes v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Guy Paul Dukes
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC and P'Pool & Roy, PLLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00530
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement by Mariner Finance, LLC (Smith, William)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Smith, III on behalf of Mariner Finance, LLC (Smith, William)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/27/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Parties to meeting within 21 days from date of service of this order; Joint report due within 10 days following the Rule 26(f) planning meeting. cc: counsel (JM)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/26/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. (Duncan, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. (Duncan, Michelle)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/16/2019 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC shall have through 9/12/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel(JM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MF Raven Holdings, Inc. for Mariner Finance, LLC. by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (AGREED) by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/6/2019 granting #4 Motion for Attorney Anna-Katrina S. Christakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Anna-Katrina S. Christakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2916082. by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Mariner Finance, LLC, #2 Summons as to P'Pool & Roy, PLLC) (ALS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2907594) filed by Guy Paul Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Mariner Note, #3 Exhibit B - Collection Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Agreed Judgment) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariner Finance, LLC
Represented By: William E. Smith, III
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P'Pool & Roy, PLLC
Represented By: Michelle Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Paul Dukes
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?