Harris v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Corey Harris
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC and P'Pool & Roy, PLLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00537
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. (Duncan, Michelle)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. (Duncan, Michelle)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/20/2019 - Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer [R. #6 ] is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including September 5, 2019. cc: Counsel (KD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MF Raven Holdings, Inc. for Mariner Finance, LLC. by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (AGREED) by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/17/2019, granting #4 - Anna-Katrina S. Christakis is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC, in this action. c: Counsel of Record (KD)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Anna-Katrina S. Christakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2924633. by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered as to Mariner Finance, LLC, #2 Summons Tendered as to P'Pool & Roy, PLLC) (ALS)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (ALS)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2910326) filed by Corey Harris. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Mariner Note, #3 Exhibit B - Collection Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Motion for Default Judgment, #5 Exhibit D - Default Judgment, #6 Exhibit E - Wage Garnishment) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariner Finance, LLC
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P'Pool & Roy, PLLC
Represented By: Michelle Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Harris
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?