Cox v. Northland Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anthony Cox
Defendant: Northland Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00542
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/9/2019 granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by the Plaintiff are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to pay its own costs and attorney fees. cc: Counsel(JWM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Defendant Northland Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keller, Stephen)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/21/2019. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards will conduct an in person Rule 16 Scheduling Conference in her chambers, Room 200, Gene Snyder Courthouse Building, 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY on 9/24/2019 at 10:30 am EDT. Counsel who will try the case shall attend. Counsel for the parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 9/3/2019. Joint report due by 9/17/2019. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel; AH-Case Manager (JWM)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 08/16/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; AEH (TJD)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Northland Insurance Company. (Keller, Stephen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-3955. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (JWM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Northland Insurance Company. by Northland Insurance Company. (JWM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northland Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-3955, filed by Northland Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-29106442356) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint & State Court Records, #2 Exhibit 2-Final Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3-Ky Dept. of Ins. Printout, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Filing in State Court, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Service, #6 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Northland Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cox
Represented By: Kevan M. Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northland Insurance Company
Represented By: Tyler D. Olson
Represented By: Stephen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?