Drain v. Hardin County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Roy Drain
Defendant: Hardin County, Kentucky, Deputy Grant, John Doe 1 Deputy, John Doe 2 Jailer, Deputy John Doe 1 and Jailer John Doe 2
Case Number: 3:2019cv00574
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 9/27/2019 granting #3 and #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The LLCC shall collect from the plaintiff's prison trust account an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $18.63 and shall forward the amount to the Clerk of the Court. Said payment shall be clearly identified by the plaintiff's name, Inmate Identification Number, and number assigned to this action. Thereafter, the LLCC shall collect the $331.37 balance of the filing fee by collecting monthly payments from the plaintiff's prison trust account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income credited to his trust account and forwarding payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). All payments shall be made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff, Finance, LLCC (MEJ)
August 28, 2019 Response to #6 Notice of Deficiency filed by Roy Drain. (AME)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE regarding address by Roy Drain. (MEJ)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: summons not tendered for each defendant. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/12/2019. (AME)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roy Drain. (AME)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roy Drain. (AME)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roy Drain. (AME)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deputy Grant, Hardin County, Kentucky, John Doe 1 Deputy, John Doe 2 Jailer filed by Roy Drain. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AME) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2019: #2 Summons) (AME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drain v. Hardin County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardin County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 Deputy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2 Jailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Drain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?