U.S. Security Associates, Inc. et al v. Gritton et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc. and Universal Protection Service, LLC
Defendant: Shaw Secure Solutions, LLC, Tim Gritton, Raymond Zweifel and Billy Shaw
Case Number: 3:2019cv00588
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/1/2019 granting #32 Motion for Refund: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue a check from the Court's Registry payable to Plaintiffs counsel's firm, Martenson, Hasbrouck & Simon LLP, in the amount of $10,000 plus any accrued interest. This action stands DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel, Finance (JM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Bond /Refund of Bond by Plaintiffs U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Refunding Bond) (Sturgeon, Arthur)
September 30, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC (Sturgeon, Arthur)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/30/2019. This action shall be DISMISSED without prejudice upon the expiration of the Temporary Restraining Order entered 8/22/2019 (D.N. 5). All dates and deadlines previously set in this matter are VACATED. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The parties shall tender an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. The Court will entertain a motion to redocket the action within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order in the event the settlement is not consummated. cc: Counsel (AME)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/30/2019. In light of the parties' Joint Notice of Withdrawal #28 , the settlement conference set for 9/3/2019 is CONTINUED. The conference will be reset by further Order of the Court should the parties so request. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (TLB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE -Joint Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction & Defendants' Motions to Vacate Temporary Restraining Order by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC re #23 MOTION to Vacate #1 Complaint, #5 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, MOTION to Dismiss , #19 MOTION to Vacate #5 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, #7 Emergency MOTION to Vacate TRO, #21 MOTION to Vacate #5 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Sturgeon, Arthur)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/30/2019. Settlement Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall review the entirety of this order. Counsel shall further send a copy of the order and discuss the order in detail with his or her client(s), as well as any persons required to attend the settlement conference (see Part II, infra). Anyone who fails to comply with any provision of this order may be subject to the full range of sanctions authorized by law. Given the timing of the settlement conference, any requests for an exception to any provision of this Order shall by submitted to Magistrate Judge's Chambers by email to chambers_lindsay@kywd.uscourts.gov no later than 4:00 PM on Friday, August 30, 2019. cc: Counsel (AME)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/29/2019 - Chambers received a phone call from counsel in this matter requesting an extension of Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the pending Emergency Motions to Vacate TRO (DNs #7 , #19 , #21 , #23 ). The Parties' request for extension is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall respond to the pending Emergency Motions to Vacate TRO (DNs #7 , #19 , #21 , #23 ) on or before 12:00 PM, noon, on Friday, August 30, 2019. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Order re #23 MOTION to Vacate #1 Complaint, #5 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, MOTION to Dismiss by Tim Gritton. (Grant, P.)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION FOR PROCEEDINGS held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/27/2019. Paragraph 8 of the Court's 8/22/2019 Order DN #5 be STAYED pending further Order of the Court. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel (AME)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Vacate #1 Complaint, #5 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, , MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Tim Gritton (Grant, P.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss /Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Sturgeon, Arthur)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Vacate #5 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by Defendant Raymond Zweifel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McKenzie, James)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Blaine Grant on behalf of Tim Gritton (Grant, P.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Vacate #5 Temporary Restraining Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, , MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendant Billy Shaw (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Billy Shaw, #2 Proposed Order) (McKenzie, James)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/27/2019 granting #16 Motion for Matthew D. Crawford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/27/2019 granting #12 Motion Wes R. McCart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Matthew D. Crawford to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2931655. by Plaintiffs U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Matthew Crawford, #3 Proposed Order) (Sturgeon, Arthur)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/26/2019. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic conference 8/27/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing toll free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744# This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (TLB)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Shaw Secure Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hargadon, Jason)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF SECURITY by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC. Receipt #L33061159. (MEJ)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Wes R. McCart to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2931055. by Plaintiffs U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Wes McCart, #3 Proposed Order) (Sturgeon, Arthur)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deposit of Security by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC (Sturgeon, Arthur)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/26/2019. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion to vacate, set aside, or modify (D.N. #7 ) no later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, 8/29/2019. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
August 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. McKenzie on behalf of Raymond Zweifel (McKenzie, James)
August 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. McKenzie on behalf of Billy Shaw (McKenzie, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION to Vacate TRO by Defendant Shaw Secure Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Vacate, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Hargadon, Jason)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason L. Hargadon on behalf of Shaw Secure Solutions, LLC (Hargadon, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Schedules: Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/4/2019 at 1:30 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge David J. Hale. (MEJ)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/22/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all nondispositive matters, including discovery issues. This matter is set for a hearing on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (D.N. 4) on 9/4/2019, at 1:30 p.m. at the Gene Snyder U.S. Courthouse in Louisville, Kentucky. This Temporary Restraining Order is effective as of 1:00 p.m. on 8/22/2019, and will expire fourteen (14) days from its entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2) unless extended by subsequent order. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tim Gritton, Billy Shaw, Shaw Secure Solutions, LLC, Raymond Zweifel. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (AME)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order) (AME)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tim Gritton, Billy Shaw, Shaw Secure Solutions, LLC, Raymond Zweifel (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2925431), filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Security Associates, Inc. et al v. Gritton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Secure Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jason L. Hargadon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Gritton
Represented By: P. Blaine Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Zweifel
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Shaw
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Represented By: D. Patton Pelfrey
Represented By: Evan S. Weiss
Represented By: Arthur T. Sturgeon, III
Represented By: Wes R. McCart
Represented By: Matthew D. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Protection Service, LLC
Represented By: D. Patton Pelfrey
Represented By: Evan S. Weiss
Represented By: Arthur T. Sturgeon, III
Represented By: Wes R. McCart
Represented By: Matthew D. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?