Kruse v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Donna Kruse
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00620
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 10/18/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: counsel (JM)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/18/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/3/2019, granting #9 - Eric P. Mathisen is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the Defendant in this action. cc: All Counsel (KD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2955437. by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Roberts, Kevin)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/5/2019, re #6 - Defendant is granted an extension of time to and including October 4, 2019, in which to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Kevin E. Roberts and Robert A. Florio via email (KD)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (MNM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (MNM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-04805 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2934366). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice Filed in State Court Action, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruse v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Kruse
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?