Sams et al v. The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ivy Sams and Ruth Snow
Defendant: The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00625
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER (EBOC) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/17/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 11/15/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/20/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/20/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2020. Daubert Motions due by 8/1/2020. Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Blue, William)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Blue, William)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Judge Claria Horn Boom (EBOC) on 9/9/2019; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (Review Order in full for specifics, including deadlines and report requirements.) cc: Counsel; TB (CDF)
September 9, 2019 Remark - Copy of Mandatory Electronic Filing and Noticing sent to Attorney Bucher. (RLK)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/9/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Blue, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL letter sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by The Anthem Companies, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-004826. ( Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2934883 ), filed by The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Jeremy Deenik, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sams et al v. The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Blue, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Sams
Represented By: Anthony Bucher
Represented By: Anthony J. Bucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Snow
Represented By: Anthony Bucher
Represented By: Anthony J. Bucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?