V-Soft Consulting Group Inc. v. Zuchowski et al
Plaintiff: V-Soft Consulting Group Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenan and Laura B. Zuchowski
Case Number: 3:2019cv00641
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to GO 2019-10. Case reassigned to Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Claria Horn Boom no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel (KD)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/23/2019, granting #6 - Monica Singh is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff V-Soft Consulting Group, Inc., in this action. cc: Counsel of Record, Quality Control (KD)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Monica Singh to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2944656. by Plaintiff V-Soft Consulting Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Williams, George)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom. The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Monica Singh filed by the plaintiff #4 is DENIED. Monica Singh is permitted to re-submit a motion which conforms to the Local Rules. cc: Counsel of Record, Monica Singh (ALS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Monica Singh to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2941064 by Plaintiff V-Soft Consulting Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (DJT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). ** ATTESTED COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL THIS DATE ** (Attachments: #1 Summons Dept. of Homeland Security, #2 Summons USCIS, #3 Summons Kenneth Cuccinelli, #4 Summons Kevin McAleean) (DJT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF & REVIEW OF AGENCY ACTION UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT against Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2940973., filed by V-Soft Consulting Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A - I-129, #4 Exhibit B - I-129, #5 Exhibit C - I-129, #6 Exhibit D - Receipt Notice, #7 Exhibit E - RFE, #8 Exhibit F - RFE Response, #9 Exhibit G - Denial, #10 Exhibit H - Itinerary Memo) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V-Soft Consulting Group Inc. v. Zuchowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura B. Zuchowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V-Soft Consulting Group Inc.
Represented By: Monica Singh
Represented By: George P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?