Sentry Steel, Inc. v. AAK USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sentry Steel, Inc.
Defendant: AAK USA Realco, LLC and AAK USA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00642
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 11/8/2019; Telephonic Rule 16 case-management Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel who have full authority to enter stipulations, make admissions, and bind the parties with respect to dates agreed upon or ordered shall participate in the conference. Parties shall meet within twenty-one (21) days from the date of service of this Order, pursuant to Rule 26(f). Parties shall file, within ten (10) days after the Rule 26(f) conference of parties, a joint status report (as set forth). (Review Order in full for specifics.) cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/7/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sentry Steel, Inc. by AAK USA Inc., AAK USA Realco, LLC. (Robertson, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sentry Steel, Inc.. All Defendants. (Golding, Ayala)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AAK USA Inc., AAK USA Realco, LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2941352) filed by Sentry Steel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, FINAL INVOICE, #3 INTENT TO WAIVE SERVICE, #4 INTENT TO WAIVE SERVICE) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentry Steel, Inc. v. AAK USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAK USA Realco, LLC
Represented By: William Craig Robertson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAK USA Inc.
Represented By: William Craig Robertson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Steel, Inc.
Represented By: Charles W. Dobbins
Represented By: Ayala Golding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?