Heyser v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Heyser
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00644
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/22/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the Toll-Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering the Access Code 7238577#. The Joint Status Report required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 shall be submitted within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (AME)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 10/18/2019 granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion to Stay. The Court VACATES the pending deadline for submission of a joint written report of the parties Rule 26 Planning Meeting. With regard to the upcoming telephonic status conference, the Court will DENY the Motion without prejudice. The 10/22/2019 telephonic status conference scheduled for 2:30 p.m. Eastern Time (1:30 p.m. Central Time) remains on the calendar. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay and Hold Case in Abeyance for 30 Days While Parties Engage in Settlement Discussions by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Edward)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Lanny King (EBOC) on 9/16/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 2:30 PM (1:30 PM CDT) before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing Toll Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering Access Code 7238577#. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/13/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co.. (O'Brien, Edward)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-004804. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (AME)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co. (AME)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-004804. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2941823), filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Sate Court Docket Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heyser v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Edward M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Heyser
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?