Gailor v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sandra K. Gailor
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Darlene Duke
Case Number: 3:2019cv00645
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Third Party Complaint by Darlene Duke. (Krauser, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Darlene Duke by Secretary of State. (RLJ)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/18/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-CHL. (ARM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Darlene Duke. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (RLJ)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Darlene Duke, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons) (Walker, Charles)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-00520. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
September 12, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Filed in Jefferson Circuit Court - See DN #1 - 2) by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (ALS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-5200 (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2941884) filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice in State Court) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gailor v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K. Gailor
Represented By: Randall L. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Darlene Duke
Represented By: Michael E. Krauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?