Colvin v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Gary D. Colvin
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00646
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-07104, filed 10/29/2019. (MLG)
October 21, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. (JM)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 159 from the Northern District of California re: MDL2741. (JM)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/15/2019 granting #4 Motion for T. Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for T. Michael Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 125) by Plaintiff Gary D. Colvin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Florida, #2 Certificate of Good Standing KY Bar, #3 Certificate of Good Standing Kentucky, #4 Proposed Order). (RLJ)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (ALS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2942100) filed by Gary D. Colvin. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colvin v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D. Colvin
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?