Electrical Workers Local 369 Benefit Fund et al v. Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Local 369 Retirement Fund, Louisville Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Committee, Electrical Workers Local 369 Benefit Fund and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369
Defendant: Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC and Mark A. Churchman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00652
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT (EBOC) - Upon the request of the Plaintiffs, default is entered against Defendant, Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC, as provided in Rule 55(a) Fed. R. Civ. P. cc: Counsel, Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC (MEJ) Modified on 11/11/2019, to reflect that default entered by the Clerk of the Court. (KD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF re: #6 MOTION for Entry of Default ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Dunn, Rex)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Local 369 Benefit Fund, Electrical Workers Local 369 Retirement Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369, Louisville Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Committee (Dunn, Rex)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Electrical Workers Local 369 Benefit Fund, Electrical Workers Local 369 Retirement Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369, Louisville Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Committee. Mark A. Churchman served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Dunn, Rex)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Electrical Workers Local 369 Benefit Fund, Electrical Workers Local 369 Retirement Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369, Louisville Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Committee. Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Dunn, Rex)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark A. Churchman, Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons to Mark A. Churchman) (ALS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (ALS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark A. Churchman, Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2943016) filed by Electrical Workers Local 369 Benefit Fund, Electrical Workers Local 369 Retirement Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369, Louisville Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Committee. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Benefit Fund Trust Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Delinquency Policy for Benefit Fund, #4 Exhibit C - Retirement Fund Trust Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Delinquency Policy for Retirement Fund, #6 Exhibit E - Letter of Assent, #7 Exhibit F - Collective Bargaining Agreement) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrical Workers Local 369 Benefit Fund et al v. Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Local 369 Retirement Fund
Represented By: Rex Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Committee
Represented By: Rex Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Local 369 Benefit Fund
Represented By: Rex Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369
Represented By: Rex Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchman Electric & Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Churchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?