Gillis v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Julia Gillis
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00663
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446er
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/29/2019. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 1/17/2020 at 11:00 am EST. The Court will initiate the call. Meeting of the parties due by 12/27/2019. Rule 26(f) meeting report due by 1/10/2020. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel; AH-Case Manager (JWM)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/29/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; AEH (TJD)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, filed by Julia Gillis. (Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/16/2019 re #11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Any state-law claims in Plaintiff's Complaint are withdrawn. Plaintiff's request for jury trial is withdrawn. Plaintiffs claims under ERISA remain. Plaintiff's amended complaint due 10/25/2019. Defendant's Motion and Memorandum of Law to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims, for a More Definite Statement, and to Strike Demand for Jury Trial pursuant to ERISA (DN #9 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. cc:counsel (JWM)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by Julia Gillis. (Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #9 by Julia Gillis. (Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/24/2019 granting #5 Motion for William B. Wahlheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel(JWM)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/24/2019 granting #6 Motion for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel(JWM)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2947632. by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2947612. by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel, re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (CDF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-005033, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2946351) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Plan Documents, #3 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillis v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Gillis
Represented By: M. Austin Mehr
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Thornsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?