Graham v. Revolution Tea, LLC
Plaintiff: Fred Graham
Defendant: Revolution Tea, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00703
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Revolution Tea, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to GO 2019-10. Case reassigned to Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Claria Horn Boom no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel (KD)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/16/2019 - Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 10:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. (KD)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/10/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (KD)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Revolution Tea, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Revolution Tea, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Revolution Tea, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-05380. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2955342, filed by Revolution Tea, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Revolution Tea, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Graham
Represented By: Paul S. Abney
Represented By: Jeremiah W. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revolution Tea, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?