Chimney Safety Institute of America v. First Call Chimney Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chimney Safety Institute of America
Defendant: David York and First Call Chimney Service, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00705
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 10/31/2019, GRANTING #5 Motion for Arthur S. Garrett, III, to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Arthur S. Garrett III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 125; receipt number L33061893) by Plaintiff Chimney Safety Institute of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Proposed Order) (ALS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to First Call Chimney Service, LLC, David York. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons York) (ALS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing or Determination re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint, (ALS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Call Chimney Service, LLC, David York (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2955697) filed by Chimney Safety Institute of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EX A - Registered US PTO, #3 Exhibit EX B - Registered CCS Service Mark, #4 Exhibit EX C - Def's Website displaying CCS Certification Mark, #6 Summons Tendered York, #7 Summons Tendered First Chimney) (ALS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chimney Safety Institute of America v. First Call Chimney Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chimney Safety Institute of America
Represented By: Thomas Patrick O'Brien, III
Represented By: Winston E. Miller
Represented By: Arthur S. Garrett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Call Chimney Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?