Glass v. Ramos et al
Plaintiff: Opie William Glass, II
Defendant: Officer David, Officer Jacob, Nurse Brenda Ramos, Officer Byron, Oldham County Detention Center and Southern Medical Group
Case Number: 3:2019cv00714
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 11/7/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Oldham County Jail shall collect from Plaintiff's trust account an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $42.79 and shall forward the amount to the Clerk of Court. Said payment shall be clearly identified by Plaintiff's name, Inmate Identification Number, and number assigned to this action. Thereafter, the Oldham County Jail shall collect the $307.21 balance of the filing fee by collecting monthly payments from Plaintiff's trust account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income credited to his trust account and forwarding payments to the Clerk of Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Clerk of Court is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. Having addressed the filing-fee issue, the Court must now undertake a preliminary review of Plaintiff's complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Once the review is complete, an order will be entered informing the parties of what steps, if any, must be taken. cc: Counsel (AME)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from Opie William Glass II. (AME)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Response to #5 Notice of Deficiency. (MEJ)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: summons not tendered for each defendant. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/4/2019. (AME)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Opie William Glass, II. (AME)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Opie William Glass, II. (AME)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Officer Byron, Officer David, Officer Jacob, Oldham County Detention Center, Brenda Ramos, Southern Medical Group, filed by Opie William Glass, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Brenda Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oldham County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opie William Glass, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?