Dang v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tony V. Dang
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00737
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Judge David J. Hale pursuant to General Order 2019-11. cc: Counsel, CM-DJH (AEH)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Summonses, complaint, and order forwarded to USMS for service. (RLJ) Modified on 10/17/2019 to correct clerk error (RLJ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 USM285) (RLJ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 11/7/2019. (RLJ)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 10/15/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is ordered to file Dang's complaint and to issue summons. The United States Marshal is ordered to serve the summons with a copy of the complaint and this Order on the Defendant. The United States shall advance the cost of service. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tony V. Dang. (MNM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (MNM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tony V. Dang. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dang v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony V. Dang
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Coleman
Represented By: Michael P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?