Louisville/Jefferson County Metro v. Intergraph Corporation
Plaintiff: Louisville/Jefferson County Metro
Defendant: Intergraph Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00746
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay (EBOC) on 10/30/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/29/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Intergraph Corporation. (O'Brien, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-05726. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (AME)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Hexagon AB for Intergraph Corporation. (AME)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Intergraph Corporation from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-05726. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2963247), filed by Intergraph Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisville/Jefferson County Metro v. Intergraph Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intergraph Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Patrick O'Brien, III
Represented By: Arthur T. Sturgeon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville/Jefferson County Metro
Represented By: I. Joel Frockt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?