Hobbs v. Cigna Group Insurance
Plaintiff: Carol Hobbs
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00749
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 11/22/2019, granting #10 - This action stands DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. (KD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal by Cigna Group Insurance by Cigna Group Insurance. (Calhoun, David)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/20/2019 - This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. All dates and deadlines previously set in this matter are VACATED. The parties shall tender an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. (KD)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Cigna Group Insurance (Calhoun, David)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards (EBOC) on 10/28/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. Participating counsel shall contact Judge Edwards' Case Manager, Ashley Henry, by e-mail at ashley_henry@kywd.uscourts.gov with their preferred contact numbers by 1/3/2020. Parties shall comply as set forth in order. cc: Counsel (AME)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cigna Group Insurance. (Wyrick, Mitzi)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/21/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-05285. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (AME)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Group Insurance. (AME)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cigna Group Insurance from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-05285. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2964305), filed by Cigna Group Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hobbs
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?