Hicks v. Begor et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Hicks
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Mark Begor
Case Number: 3:2019cv00775
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/18/2019 denying #4 Motion. If Plaintiff's action is allowed to proceed past initial screening, the Court will order the issuance of summons and direct the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendant(s). Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). cc: pro se Plaintiff (RLJ)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings (EBOC) on 11/22/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se(JWM)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to issue Summons by Plaintiff Joseph Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope). (RLJ)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (short form) by Plaintiff Joseph Hicks. (MNM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Begor and Equifax Information Services, LLC, filed by Joseph Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Summons Tendered, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Begor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Begor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?