Pinolillo Masonry, LLC v. Division 4 Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Pinolillo Masonry, LLC
Defendant: Division 4 Construction, LLC
Counter Defendant: Petronilo Verastegui Olvera
Case Number: 3:2019cv00805
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Petronilo Verastegui Olvera. Counsel for Counter-Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (ALS)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 DIVISION 4 CONSTRUCTION, LLC'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES against Petronilo Verastegui Olvera, Pinolillo Masonry, LLC by Division 4 Construction, LLC. (ALS)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER JOINING ADDITIONAL PARTY ON COUNTERCLAIM signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 12/30/2019; Granting #7 Motion for Leave to Join Additional Party to Amended Counterclaim. (ALS)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 11/26/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/7/2020. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Join Additional Party to Amended Counterclaim by Defendant Division 4 Construction, LLC, Counter Claimant Division 4 Construction, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Summons - Verastegui) (Riddle, Benjamin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pinolillo Masonry, LLC. (Stoess, Ray)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Pinolillo Masonry, LLC by Division 4 Construction, LLC. (Riddle, Benjamin)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Division 4 Construction, LLC. (Riddle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Division 4 Construction, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-02114 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2977942). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice Filed in State Court Action, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinolillo Masonry, LLC v. Division 4 Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division 4 Construction, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin L. Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinolillo Masonry, LLC
Represented By: Ray H. Stoess, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Petronilo Verastegui Olvera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?