Springstone, Inc. v. Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Springstone, Inc.
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00821
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response of Plaintiff Springstone In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Springstone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Collective exhibit of three letters) (Vance, Palmer)
December 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENDED BRIEFING DEADLINES Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom - The Proposed Order Extending Briefing Deadlines [R. #6 ] is GRANTED. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Briefing Schedule by Springstone, Inc. by Springstone, Inc.. (Vance, Palmer)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Springstone, Inc.. (Vance, Palmer)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Rambicure, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-006311. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2981324, filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springstone, Inc. v. Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springstone, Inc.
Represented By: Adam C. Reeves
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Rambicure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?