Cox v. NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tony Dean Cox
Defendant: NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00824
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446fm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lanny King: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/6/2020. No later than 1/15/2020, counsel for the parties shall make all initial disclosures required of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1). No later than 4/15/2020, the Parties shall file all motions to join additional parties, as well as all motions to amend the pleadings. No later than 10/15/2020, the parties shall complete all discovery. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 6/1/2020. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 7/1/2020. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 11/16/2020. Motions pertaining to unresolved discovery and scheduling disputes may not be filed without first having a joint telephonic conference with the Magistrate Judge. Please see Order for further details. cc: Counsel (KD)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc.. (Bork, Melissa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc.. (Bork, Melissa)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. EST (9:00 a.m. CDT) before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing Toll Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering Access Code 7238577#. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. (KD)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/13/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc.. (Bork, Melissa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. (SMJ)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (SMJ)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-006560. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2982437), filed by NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Dean Cox
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Precision of America, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly J. O'Donnell
Represented By: Melissa Norman Bork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?