Thompson v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lois A. Thompson
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00866
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/21/2020: This action stands DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: counsel (JM)
January 19, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (van der Heiden, Kimberly)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/3/2019 - Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel (KD)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/27/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (SMJ)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc. for Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (SMJ)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (SMJ)
November 26, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., previously filed in state court action (SMJ)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. from Hardin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01703, (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2992514), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Affidavit in support of removal, #3 Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois A. Thompson
Represented By: Dallas E. George
Represented By: Elmer J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly K. van der Heiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?