Edelen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Julius Edelen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00912
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Julius Edelen. (Wax, Alvin)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 1/27/2020. (KD)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summonses and a copy of the Complaint were forwarded to the USM for service. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (KD)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/3/2020 - Edelen's application to proceed without prepayment of fees (DN #2 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file Edelen's Complaint and issue summons. The United States Marshal shall serve the summons with a copy of the Complaint on Defendant. The United States shall advance the cost of service. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Order by Julius Edelen. (Wax, Alvin)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason for Deficiency: no proposed order. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/3/2020. (SMJ)
December 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (SMJ)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Julius Edelen. (SMJ)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Julius Edelen. (Attachments: #1 Summons three tendered) (SMJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2019: #2 Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) (SMJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edelen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Edelen
Represented By: Alvin D. Wax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?