Dunham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christopher Charles Dunham, Sr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00924
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/20/2019 granting #5 Motion for Attorney Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3007185. by Plaintiff Christopher Charles Dunham, Sr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Palmer, Melissa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 1/9/2020. (MNM)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (MNM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3006202, filed by Christopher Charles Dunham, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Exhibit B - Granted Extension Request, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Charles Dunham, Sr.
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?