Mencer v. Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mischell Mencer
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00086
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
2 Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 3/25/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. (KD)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/23/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Mayo, LaToi)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses by Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Mayo, LaToi)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (ALS)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Claria Horn Boom recused. Case reassigned to Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedingscc: Counsel, CM (ALS)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Services, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DLW)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DLW)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3036021, filed by Mischell Mencer. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered, #2 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mencer v. Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mischell Mencer
Represented By: Tyler Z. Korus
Represented By: Robert L. Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?