McDonald v. The Kroger Co.
Plaintiff: Melvinia McDonald
Defendant: The Kroger Co. and The Kroger Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00120
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441wt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, (Motion for Added Extension of Time) filed by The Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Executive Order 2020-257) (Ellis, Rudy)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, (Motion for Added Extension of Time) by Plaintiff Melvinia McDonald (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Donnell, Harry)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/20/2020. Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff SHALL have up to and including 4/2/2020, within which to file a Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss #5 . cc: Counsel (ALS)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss to April 2, 2020 by Plaintiff Melvinia McDonald (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Donnell, Harry)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 2/21/2020. Judge Justin R. Walker RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to Judge Claria Horn Boom for all further proceedings. Counsel shall change the case number to reflect the initials CHB for all future filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-CHB (MEJ)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Kroger Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellis, Rudy)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Meade Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kroger Co.. (DJT)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by The Kroger Co. from Meade Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00014. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3042521, filed by The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint & Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Collective Bargaining Agreement - 2015-19, #4 Exhibit D - Collective Bargaining Agreement - 2019-23, #5 Exhibit Proof of Service on Defendant, #6 Exhibit Notice of Filing in State Court) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvinia McDonald
Represented By: Harry Bernard O'Donnell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Rudy J. Ellis, III
Represented By: Faith C. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Company
Represented By: Rudy J. Ellis, III
Represented By: Faith C. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?