Tucker v. Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Alfreda Tucker
Defendant: Liberty Life Assuance Company of Boston and Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston
Case Number: 3:2020cv00129
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/24/2020 - This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. All dates and deadlines previously set in this matter are VACATED. The parties shall tender an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within forty-five (45) days of entry of this Order. (KD)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston (Mathisen, Eric)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 2/27/2020 granting #6 Motion for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIMETO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/24/2020, granting #7 - Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed no later than March 25, 2020. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 2/24/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Liberty Life Assuance Company of Boston, Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3047883. by Defendants Liberty Life Assuance Company of Boston, Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston (Attachments: #1 Declaratoin of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston. (DJT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Liberty Life Assuance Company of Boston, Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston (DJT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston, Liberty Life Assuance Company of Boston from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-007616. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3046444, filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston, Liberty Life Assuance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, state court record, #3 Exhibit B, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in the state court mat) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assuance Company of Boston
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Co. of Boston
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreda Tucker
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?