The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. v. Kentucky Colonels International et al
Plaintiff: The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. and Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc
Defendant: Kentucky Colonels International, Globcal International, Ecology Crossroads Cooperative Foundation, Inc., David J. Wright and Unknown Defendants
Case Number: 3:2020cv00132
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 4/1/2020 granting #5 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 ( #6 ) to its Verified Complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/23/2020 granting #31 Second Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order. The temporary restraining order previously entered in this matter DE #14 is EXTENDED for a period of sixty (60) days following entry of this Order. Defendants SHALL, after obtaining counsel, file an answer, counterclaim, or any brief in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction DE #7 within sixty (60) days following entry of this Order. cc: Counsel, Defendants (via mail) (SMJ)
March 20, 2020 Filing 31 Second MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coryell, Cornelius)
March 16, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Filing Official Transcript re #29 Transcript - Court Official,,. Please review the complete Notice for instructions. (Dowell, April)
March 16, 2020 Filing 29 FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 03/04/2020, before Judge David J. Hale. Court Reporter April R. Dowell, Telephone number 502-625-3779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (Dowell, April)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/23/2020: The temporary restraining order currently in effect in this matter #14 is EXTENDED for a period of fourteen (14) days and will expire on3/23/2020.cc: counsel, Defendants (JM)
March 9, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or Continue with Extension of Time filed by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Email from Defendant Wright, #2 Proposed Order) (Coryell, Cornelius)
March 9, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coryell, Cornelius)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/9/2020; IT IS ORDERED that Judge David J. Hale RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to the docket of Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials RGJ on all future pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, CM-Judge Jennings (NWT)
March 4, 2020 Please see DN #24 for pdf. MOTION to Continue with Time Extension by Defendant David J. Wright. (KD)
March 4, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss or Continue with Time Extension by Defendant David J. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Defendant, #2 Transmittal Letter) (KD)
March 4, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by David J. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (KD)
March 4, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF HEARING for proceedings held before Judge David J. Hale: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 3/4/2020. Defendants failed to appear. The Court heard testimony and received evidence on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. (Docket No. #7 ) At the conclusion of the hearing the Court took the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: April Dowell) (KD)
March 3, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1:Sherry Crose Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2: Defendants' Response, #3 Proposed Order) (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 27, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Posting Injunction Bond by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. re #14 Temporary Restraining Order,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: receipt) (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 27, 2020 Remark: $1000 paid into Registry, Receipt #L33063142 (JLP)
February 27, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT re #7 Motion for TRO,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: 2/25/20 Counsel Email to Defendant Wright, #2 Exhibit 2: 2/26/20 10:55 am Counsel Email to Defendant Wright, #3 Exhibit 3: 2/26/20 11:28 am Defendant Wright Email to Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4: 2/26/20 2:25 pm Counsel Email to Defendant Wright, #5 Exhibit 5: 2/26/20 4:42 pm Defendant Wright Email to Counsel, #6 Exhibit 6: "New" KCI Website, #7 Exhibit 7: PayPal Page) by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.. (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 25, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT re #12 Order,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: 2/24/20 email, #2 Exhibit 2: second 2/24/20 email, #3 Exhibit 3: Counsel's transmittal email, #4 Exhibit 4: Proof of Service forms) by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.. (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 25, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.. Ecology Crossroads Cooperative Foundation, Inc. served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.. Globcal International served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.. Kentucky Colonels International served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 2/25/2020 - HOKC's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (D.N. #7 ) is GRANTED in part. Pursuant to Rule 65(b)(3), this matter is set for a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (D.N. #7 ) on March 4, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. at the Gene Snyder U.S. Courthouse in Louisville, Kentucky. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c), Plaintiff HOKC shall give security in the amount of $1,000.00, which the Court considers proper based upon the current record. The security shall be tendered to the Clerk of Court no later than the close of business Friday, February 28, 2020. This Temporary Restraining Order is effective as of 12:00 p.m., February 25, 2020 and will expire fourteen (14) days from its entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2) unless it is terminated or extended by subsequent order. (KD)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT re #12 Order,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1:February 22, 2020 email, #2 Exhibit 2:Email delivery notification, #3 Exhibit 3: Dunn Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A to Dunn Affidavit, #5 Exhibit B to Dunn Affidavit) by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.. (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 2/21/2020 re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. (HOKC). Irrespective of the certificate of service indicating that HOKC's motion was served on the defendants by mail (D.N. #7 , PageID # 173), Rule 65(b)(1)(B) requires HOKC to explain to the Court why a temporary restraining order should be entered before the defendants have received notice. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that no later than the close of business Monday, February 24, 2020, HOKC shall supplement its motion for temporary restraining order to comply with Rule 65(b)(1)(B). cc: Counsel; Defendants (CDF)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (DLW)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION: Redocketed as DN #11 for proper event Modified on 2/21/2020 (DLW).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 2/21/2020. Judge Justin R. Walker RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. Counsel shall change the case number to reflect the initials DJH for all future filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-DJH (MEJ)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1:HOKC Chart and Documents, #2 Exhibit 2:Wright Editorial, #3 Exhibit 3:KCI Website from 2/17/20, #4 Exhibit 4:Paypal Screenshot, #5 Exhibit 5:KCI Blog, #6 Exhibit 6:Facebook Screenshot, #7 Exhibit 7:KCI Search Result from IRS Website, #8 Exhibit 8:Ecology's Search Result from IRS Website, #9 Exhibit 9:Kentucky AOG Charitable Organization Registry, #10 Exhibit 10: Kentucky AOG Charitable Organization Registry, #11 Exhibit 11:Articles of Incorporation of Ecology Crossroads, #12 Exhibit 12: Kentucky Colonel Wikipedia Article, #13 Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order, #14 Proposed Order Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 Sealed Document re #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal) KCI "Merger Proposal" Package) (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document by Plaintiff The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coryell, Cornelius)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ecology Crossroads Cooperative Foundation, Inc., Globcal International, Kentucky Colonels International, David J. Wright. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Globcal International, #2 Summons Issued as to Ecology Crossroads Cooperative Foundation, Inc., #3 Summons Issued as to David J. Wright) (DLW)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. (DLW)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Ecology Crossroads Cooperative Foundation, Inc., Globcal International, Kentucky Colonels International, David J. Wright, Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3047059, filed by The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5/2/31 Minutes, #2 Exhibit 2 - Federal Trademark Registrations and Applications Chart, #3 Exhibit 3 - January 2020 Wright Proposal to HOKC (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4 - Wright Editorial, #5 Exhibit 5 - Kentucky Colonel Wikipedia Article, as of February 18, 2020, #6 Exhibit 6 - Facebook Screenshot, #7 Exhibit 7 - 9/29/2000 WhoIs Data, #8 Exhibit 8 - 1/20/2020 WhoIs Data, #9 Summons Tendered - Kentucky Colonels International, #10 Summons Tendered - Globcal International, #11 Summons Tendered - Ecology Crossroads Cooperative Foundation, Inc., #12 Summons Tendered - David J. Wright, #13 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc. v. Kentucky Colonels International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc.
Represented By: Julie L. Watts
Represented By: Cornelius E. Coryell, II
Represented By: T. Michelle B. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honorable Order of Kentucky Colonels, Inc
Represented By: Julie L. Watts
Represented By: Cornelius E. Coryell, II
Represented By: T. Michelle B. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Colonels International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globcal International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecology Crossroads Cooperative Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?