Renn v. Bullitt County Tires, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kris Renn
Defendant: James E. Bennet, Jr. and Bullitt County Tires, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00141
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 020
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing by Kris Renn re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Astbury, Warren)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Counter Defendant Kris Renn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 31 Email to Defendants' Counsel) (Astbury, Warren) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (DLW).
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: Incorrect document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #10 Amended Complaint ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Asay, Joseph)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bullitt County Tires, Inc., filed by Kris Renn. (Asay, Joseph) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/3/2020) (DLW).
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Order re #7 MOTION for Warren Astbury to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3070815. by Kris Renn. (Asay, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT(s) re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kris Renn. (Asay, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Warren Astbury to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3070815. by Plaintiff Kris Renn (Asay, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (JM).
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Kris Renn by James E. Bennet, Jr, Bullitt County Tires, Inc.. (Alexander, Stuart)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kris Renn. James E. Bennet, Jr. served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (JM)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 ERROR: Efiler used incorrect ECF event. This executed summons has been refiled by the Clerk. Please see DN #5 for viewing.
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James E. Bennet, Jr., Bullitt County Tires, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Bullitt) (DJT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James E. Bennet, Jr., Bullitt County Tires, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3048594., filed by Kris Renn. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renn v. Bullitt County Tires, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Renn
Represented By: Joseph Corey Asay
Represented By: Warren D. Astbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Bennet, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart E. Alexander, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullitt County Tires, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart E. Alexander, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?