Premier Land Development Company, LLC v. Bedrock Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Premier Land Development Company, LLC
Defendant: Bedrock Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00149
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Bedrock Contracting, Inc.. (Burnham, Ralph)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bedrock Contracting, Inc.. (Burnham, Ralph)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bedrock Contracting, Inc.. (Burnham, Ralph)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 Bedrock Contracting, Inc. ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Premier Land Development Company, LLC by Bedrock Contracting, Inc.. (Burnham, Ralph)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph E. Burnham on behalf of Bedrock Contracting, Inc. (Burnham, Ralph)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Bedrock Contracting, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DLW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bedrock Contracting, Inc., filed by Premier Land Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Exhibit B- Demand Letter, #3 Summons Tendered) (DLW)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Judge Justin R. Walker on 4/8/2020 granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Discharging Show Cause Order. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file the proposed Amended Complaint. The Court DISCHARGES Premier's obligations under the Show Cause Order. The Court ORDERS Premier to forward this Order to Bedrock's lawyer within 24 hours of when Premier receives this Order. cc: Counsel (DLW)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1(f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-CHL (MEJ)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Premier Land Development Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Proposed Order) (Clowers, Jackie)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 3/6/2020. The Court ORDERS that Premier may amend, or seek leave to amend, its Complaint to address the jurisdictional deficiencies. Premier's deadline for amending, or seeking leave to amend, its Complaint is March 27, 2020. Please see Show Cause Order for further details. (KD)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bedrock Contracting, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DLW)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bedrock Contracting, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3052185, filed by Premier Land Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons Tendered) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Land Development Company, LLC v. Bedrock Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedrock Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: James Kelly Ratliff
Represented By: Ralph E. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Land Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Jackie R. Clowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?