Lexington Insurance Company v. Southern Supply Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Defendant: Southern Supply Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00158
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 4/6/2020 - Plaintiff's unopposed motion to amend and remand (D.N. #16 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file the tendered first amended complaint (D.N. 16-1) in the record of this matter. This matter is REMANDED to Jefferson Circuit Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(e) and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. (KD)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Southern Supply Company, LLC, filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (KD)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 Stipulated Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint & Remanding Civil Action re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Remand by Lexington Insurance Company. (Ellison, Matthew) Modified on 4/2/2020, to clarify docket. (KD)
March 25, 2020 NOTICE of email confirmation as to Matthew Ellison re #14 Request for Fee Refund. (MLG)
March 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Remand by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Proposed Order) (Ellison, Matthew)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 3/24/2020 granting #12 Motion for Larry W. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #13 Motion for Brandon Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Fee Refund by Lexington Insurance Company. (Ellison, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Brandon Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3068137. by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellison, Matthew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Larry W. Jenkins, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3068130. by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ellison, Matthew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Supply Company, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, Case Number 20-CI-001122, filed by Southern Supply Company, LLC. (KD)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/11/2020, re #7 and #9 - The Clerk of Court shall file the tendered Amended Notice of Removal (D.N. 9-2) in the record of this matter. (KD)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Southern Supply Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DOI Profile on Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Notice of Removal) (Walker, Charles)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/4/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel (DLW)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/3/2020 - Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, Defendant Southern Supply Company shall SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be remanded to Jefferson Circuit Court for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (KD)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Larry W. Jenkins re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/23/2020. (KJA)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Brandon T. Brown re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/23/2020. (KJA)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/3/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
March 2, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Southern Supply Company, LLC. (DJT)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Southern Supply Company, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-001122. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3054953, filed by Southern Supply Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal Filed in State Court, #4 Exhibit Answer from State Court, #5 Exhibit Complaint from State Court, #6 Exhibit Summons from State Court) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company v. Southern Supply Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Supply Company, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Walker
Represented By: Zachary C. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew D. Ellison
Represented By: Larry W. Jenkins
Represented By: Brandon T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?