McKinney v. Schafer
Plaintiff: McKinney and Laticia McKinney
Defendant: Schafer and Jonathan E. Schafer
Case Number: 3:2020cv00188
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 4/30/2020, granting #13 - This action stands DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. All dates and deadlines are VACATED. (KD)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order OF DISMISSAL by Jonathan E. Schafer. (Brown, Martha)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE of email confirmation as to Jonathan Hollan re #11 and #12 Request for Fee Refund #12 . (MLG)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Fee Refund by Laticia McKinney. (Hollan, Jonathan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Fee Refund by Laticia McKinney. (Hollan, Jonathan)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 4/13/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call. (KD)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/10/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jonathan E. Schafer. (Brown, Martha)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jonathan E. Schafer. (Brown, Martha)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jonathan E. Schafer. (Brown, Martha)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Jonathan E. Schafer COMPLETED on 4/2/2020. Secretary of State return states 3/18/2020. (KD)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jonathan E. Schafer. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan E. Schafer Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3063974., filed by Laticia McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan E. Schafer
Represented By: Martha Lynne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laticia McKinney
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Represented By: Jonathan B. Hollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?