Madden v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Thomas Madden
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00191
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klapheke, David)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 3/31/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/31/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (SMJ)
March 16, 2020 ANSWER (filed in state court) to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (SMJ)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (SMJ)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SMJ)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-001008, (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3065028), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - state court record, #2 Cover Sheet) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madden v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard W. Edwards
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Madden
Represented By: Vincent E. Johnson
Represented By: Jason L. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?