Davis v. Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Davis
Defendant: Cole R. Gilliland and Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00199
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 5/15/2020. On the Court's motion, the telephonic scheduling conference set for 5/18/2020 is REMANDED from the Court's docket. Based on the parties' #8 Rule 26(f) Report, the Court ORDERS: Joinder/Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2020. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 12/30/2020. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 3/30/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 6/30/2021. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: counsel (DLW)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc.. (Davis, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cole R. Gilliland. (Davis, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc., Cole R. Gilliland. (Davis, Michael)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND REPORT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 3/25/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (*see order for deadlines.) cc: counsel (DLW)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1(f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Regina S. Edwards to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-RSE (MEJ)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Hardin County Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (KD)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc. (KD)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (KD)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc. from Hardin Circuit Court, Case Number 20-CI-00337 ( Filing fee $400.00 - Receipt Number 0644-3067861), filed by Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - State Court Pleadings, #2 Cover Sheet) (KD)
March 19, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed in Hardin County Circuit Court by Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc. (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Davis
Represented By: Caroline B. Clay
Represented By: Philip R. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole R. Gilliland
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett's Delivery Service, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?