Be Well Providers, LLC v. Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.
Plaintiff: Be Well Providers, LLC
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00241
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441eb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC)on 4/24/2020. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay shall conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 6/23/2020 at 9:30 am EDT. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel for the parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties required by Rule 26(f) by 6/2/2020. Counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report required by Rule 26(f) by 6/16/2020. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel; TB-Case Manager (JWM)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 4/24/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; TLB (TJD)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.. (Harrison, Miles)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 4/8/2020 granting #6 Proposed Agreed Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Anthem is granted an extension of time up to and including April 27, 2020 within which to answer and/or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.. (Harrison, Miles)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.. (Skolnick, Cory)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING CIVIL COVER SHEET by Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Skolnick, Cory)
April 2, 2020 Schedules set answer due date 4/27/2020 (JWM)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action 20-CI-001585. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (JWM)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-001585. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3076102 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Jefferson Circuit Court Record 20-CI-001585) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2020: #2 Cover Sheet) (JWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Be Well Providers, LLC v. Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Be Well Providers, LLC
Represented By: Trevor L. Earl
Represented By: Lisa English Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Represented By: Miles Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?