Creekmur v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Denise Creekmur
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00270
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 9:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. (KD)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A. Jackson on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Jackson, Gregory)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/16/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (NWT)
April 15, 2020 Please see DN #5 for pdf. Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (KD)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Mays, Laura)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Mays, Laura)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hardin Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Hardin Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00508. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3084123, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Correspondence from Pl's counsel, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creekmur v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Creekmur
Represented By: Thomas P. Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Laura L. Mays
Represented By: Gregory A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?