Williams v. DABS Investment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Williams
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc., DABS Investment, LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00271
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 5/14/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/25/2020. cc: Counsel (ALS)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Mays, Laura)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 19-CI-002358. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (JWM)
April 15, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC. (See DN #1 ) (JWM)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (JWM)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-002358. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3084271 ) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Answers to Requests for Admission, #4 Exhibit C-Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal entered 7/18/19, #5 Exhibit D-Doc #11 WD of KY, #6 Exhibit E-4/7/2020 Tendered Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal, #7 Exhibit F-4/14/2020 Entered Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal, #8 Exhibit G-Lowe's Discovery Responses, #9 Exhibit H-State Court Filings) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. DABS Investment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Laura L. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DABS Investment, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC
Represented By: Laura L. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Laura L. Mays
Represented By: Gregory A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Williams
Represented By: Brenton D. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?