LG&E and KU Energy Pension Plan et al v. Rollins et al
Plaintiff: LG&E and KU Energy LLC, LG&E and KU Energy Pension Plan and The Employee Benefit Plan Board
Defendant: Gloria Jean Rollins and Annette Francis Harrod
Case Number: 3:2020cv00363
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LG&E and KU Energy Pension Plan, LG&E and KU Energy LLC, The Employee Benefit Plan Board. Annette Francis Harrod served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (Canaday, Theresa)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Annette Francis Harrod and Gloria Jean Rollins. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued- Annette Francis Harrod) (SRH)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (SRH)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Annette Francis Harrod and Gloria Jean Rollins, Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3106187, filed by LG&E and KU Energy Pension Plan, LG&E and KU Energy LLC, and The Employee Benefit Plan Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Willie and Gloria's Marriage Certificate, #2 Exhibit B- Willie and Annette's Marriage Certificate, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons tendered- Gloria Jean Rollins, #5 Summons tendered- Annette Francis Harrod) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LG&E and KU Energy Pension Plan et al v. Rollins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LG&E and KU Energy LLC
Represented By: Theresa A. Canaday
Represented By: Miles Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LG&E and KU Energy Pension Plan
Represented By: Theresa A. Canaday
Represented By: Miles Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Employee Benefit Plan Board
Represented By: Theresa A. Canaday
Represented By: Miles Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Jean Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Francis Harrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?