Ottersbach v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Ottersbach
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00380
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/22/2020, re #24 - Ottersbach's claims against Ethicon, LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Ethicon, LLC as a defendant in the record of this matter. This Order does not affect Ottersbach's claims against any other defendant. (KD)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 6/18/2020 granting #60 Motion for Lee Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #61 Motion for Christopher A. Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
June 15, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Michelle Tiger and Thomas R. Kline. (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Plaintiff Nancy Ottersbach (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Balefsky, Lee)
June 15, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Christopher A. Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3120350. by Plaintiff Nancy Ottersbach (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standin) (Balefsky, Lee)
June 15, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Lee Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3120343. by Plaintiff Nancy Ottersbach (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standin) (Balefsky, Lee)
June 8, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM COURT'S SERVICE LIST by Michael A. Tanenbaum, Esq. on behalf of terminated party Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 cover letter) (CDF)
June 1, 2020 Filing 58 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Michelle L. Tiger re #52 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/18/2020. (KJA)
June 1, 2020 Filing 57 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Thomas R. Kline re #52 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/15/2020. (KJA)
June 1, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (William M. Gage, Benjamin M. Watson, Kari L. Sutherland, and Susan M. Robinson). (Continue to receive notice:No) by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Consent of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon LLC and Johnson & Johnson, #2 Proposed Order) (Pope, Susan)
June 1, 2020 Filing 55 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Lee B. Balefsky re #52 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/15/2020. (KJA)
June 1, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan J. Pope on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Pope, Susan)
June 1, 2020 Filing 53 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (KJA)
June 1, 2020 Filing 52 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-09729. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA)
May 29, 2020 Filing 51 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 50 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (6857) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (6972) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (7113) Notice of Adoption of Reply in Support of Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 49 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6796) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6966) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (7093) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 48 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6876) Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6877) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 47 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #27 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #28 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #29 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 46 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 45 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3621) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 43 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #42 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs Mot to Substitute Amended Ex A to Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) Defs Reply to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) Defs Reply to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6641) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (6951) Notice of Adoption of Pls Response to Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (7120) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 42 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/01/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/31/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/19/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (Dismissing Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation with Prejudice and Transferring Cases to MDL 2327) granting the JOINT MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation to Dismiss With Prejudice filed in MDL 2326; Defendant BSC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as a defendant in the actions listed in Exhibit A; the Clerk is directed to disassociate the civil actions as member cases in MDL 2326 and re-associate them with MDL 2327. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 39 OPPOSITION by Nancy Ottersbach to #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 38 OPPOSITION by Nancy Ottersbach to #35 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Michael Margolis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibits)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Nancy Ottersbach in support of #38 Response. (Balefsky, Lee) (Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct document link) (lca). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 36 INCORRECT ENTRY; Image removed. (Modified on 10/31/2018 to remove image as a duplicate of #38) (lca). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Michael Margolis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PSR, #2 Exhibit Medical Records, #3 Exhibit Expert Report)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christine Ann Bates, Douglas Ottersbach, Keith Ottersbach, Matt Ottersbach, Michael Ottersbach, and Cheryl Troulock on dates and at times to be determined. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kevin Lloyd Morrow on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Morrow, Kevin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Benjamin M. Watson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Watson, Benjamin) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Subpoena to Dr. Ryan Malone by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re: #26 Amended Notice of Video Deposition (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Ryan Malone on 08/10/2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Nancy Ottersbach pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER The #20 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/14/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Appendix A & B) (hkl) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #20 Motion by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing and Supporting Memorandum (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Defendants' #15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice; denying as moot #15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Nancy Ottersbach on May 1, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Defendants' #15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Nancy Ottersbach on 05/01/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Ryan J. Malone on 5/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Nancy Ottersbach. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
July 10, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 12, 2013 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman/Partner on 05/30/2013. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 5/9/2013, answer due 7/8/2013. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
June 12, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Ethicon, Inc., #2 Summons - Ethicon, LLC) (skh) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Nancy Ottersbach for Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re: #1 Short Form Complaint (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 2, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 44 (SHOW CAUSE ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF COLOPLAST A/S, COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC AND PORGES S.A.) entered on 04/19/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (jap) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]
May 1, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2386286. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ottersbach v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Kevin Lloyd Morrow
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: James H. Keale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Watson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: Lori Elizabeth Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Watson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: Lori Elizabeth Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Susan J. Pope
Represented By: Lori Elizabeth Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ottersbach
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Thomas R. Kline
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?